IN HB1129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the House without amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infant screening. Requires every infant to be screened for Adrenoleukodystrophy (ALD) at the earliest feasible time. Requires the infant pulse oximetry screening examination to be given according to rules adopted by the state department of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infant screening.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-17SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13SenateSenator Becker added as cosponsor
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseCosponsor: Senator Tomes
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Walker, Bohacek
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Gutwein added as coauthor
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives Barrett and Fleming added as coauthors
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Lauer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1129/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/8/8/6b88067e/HB1129.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/5/b/4f5b35de/HB1129.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/7/f/a57fc014/HB1129.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/c/d/edcde8a9/HB1129.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/a/3/2ea30ae3/HB1129.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/7/5/6c757cec/HB1129.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/3/6/10368222/HB1129.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/c/e/f1ce1a1c/HB1129.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/a/6/02a6adec/HB1129.49_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/9/d/429d831f/HB1129.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/8/8/9c885b48/HB1129.212_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback