IN HB1128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Construction permits. Provides that a local unit may not require, as a condition precedent to granting, issuing, or approving certain permits for any Class 1 or Class 2 structures, completion of work upon which the performance bond or other surety was obtained prior to recording the secondary plat. Provides that a local unit may not require, as a condition precedent to granting, issuing, or approving a certificate of occupancy for any Class 1 or Class 2 structure, the completion of work upon which the performance bond or other surety was obtained prior to recording the secondary plat, unless required under certain state building laws or another law to meet a local unit's basic needs for public health and safety. Requires a local governmental agency to issue certain permits to a person not later than 12 business days after the person has filed a completed application and meets all required conditions, in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction permits. Provides that a local unit may not require, as a condition precedent to granting, issuing, or approving certain permits for any Class 1 or Class 2 structures, completion of work upon which the performance bond or other surety was obtained prior to recording the secondary plat. Provides that a local unit may not require, as a condition precedent to granting, issuing, or approving a certificate of occupancy for any Class 1 or Class 2 structure, the completion of work upon which the performance bond or other surety was obtained prior to recording the secondary plat, unless required under certain state building laws or another law to meet a local unit's basic needs for public health and safety. Requires a local governmental agency to issue certain permits to a person not later than 12 business days after the person has filed a completed application and meets all required conditions, in certain instances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 125
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 371: yeas 47, nays 1
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateSenator Rogers added as second sponsor
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Hostettler added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Doriot
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 87, nays 7
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentative Moed added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Miller D

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1128/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/2/7/642749e2/HB1128.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/2/8/7c28d600/HB1128.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/b/1/b9b15787/HB1128.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/f/8/43f8320e/HB1128.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/d/2/54d2dafd/HB1128.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/3/6/f536e3dd/HB1128.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/8/e/8f8e30bd/HB1128.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/2/e0924fba/HB1128.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/4/6/2f4659c9/HB1128.99.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/e/1/64e1901a/HB1128.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/b/9/78b9de49/HB1128.371.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback