IN HB1127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health and addiction forensic treatments. Removes a provision that allows a: (1) delinquent child's; or (2) person's; Medicaid participation to be terminated following a two year suspension due to certain adjudications or incarceration. Adds competency restoration services to the list of treatment and wraparound recovery services made available to certain persons in the criminal justice system. Adds competency restoration services to the list of services that qualify a person for mental health and addiction forensic treatment services. Adds: (1) recovery community organizations; and (2) recovery residences; certified by the division of mental health and addiction (division) or its designee to the list of organizations eligible for certain funds and grants from the division. Requires demographic data concerning race and ethnicity to be included in certain demographic research performed by the division.
Title
Mental health and addiction forensic treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Public Law 57 |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 319: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Tallian |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Koch, Crider |
2021-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Pierce |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |