IN HB1125 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Deceptive lead generation. Makes false, misleading, or deceptive advertisements for claims related to medical devices and legend drugs and certain other actions a deceptive act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deceptive lead generation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 176
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 474: yeas 31, nays 18
2021-04-20HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 474: yeas 90, nays 0
2021-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-19SenateSenator Gaskill added as conferee
2021-04-19SenateSenator Taylor G removed as conferee
2021-04-19SenateSenator Gaskill removed as advisor
2021-04-06SenateSenate advisors appointed: Gaskill, Lanane and Tallian
2021-04-06SenateSenate conferees appointed: Brown L and Taylor G
2021-04-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Olthoff, Jeter and Bauer M
2021-04-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehman and Hatfield
2021-03-30HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-03-25HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 48, nays 1
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Tallian
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 179: yeas 97, nays 1
2021-02-16HouseRepresentatives Olthoff and Hatfield added as coauthors
2021-02-16HouseRepresentatives Schaibley and Hatfield removed as coauthors
2021-02-16HouseAmendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-16HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15HouseRepresentatives Steuerwald, Schaibley, Hatfield added as coauthors
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1125/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/f/7/bcf71261/HB1125.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/8/5/6e859a3b/HB1125.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/c/5/19c5ce0f/HB1125.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/7/b/d07be627/HB1125.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/f/a/f6fa86bc/HB1125.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/6/b/c56bbd78/HB1125.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/b/4/deb4e293/HB1125.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/6/a/b06afee1/HB1125.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/b/6/7eb6f889/HB1125.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/d/7/c1d753d6/HB1125.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/1/d/b51dd54e/HB1125.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/1/5/66157b94/HB1125.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/1/9/7a1917ac/HB1125.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/9/f/6e9f7ad1/HB1125.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/d/e09d9ce0/HB1125.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/4/2/0f427bf1/HB1125.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/e/8/fee83131/HB1125.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/2/3/56231db7/HB1125.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/e/5/a6e51a7b/HB1125.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/b/2/34b23dc8/HB1125.04.COMS.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/c/032c0f49/HB1125.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/7/b/897bdf81/HB1125.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/0/e/5b0ebb55/HB1125.179_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/d/7/75d7a38a/HB1125.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/e/9/b3e94644/HB1125.255_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/c/b/8fcb3aaa/HB1125.474_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback