IN HB1122 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 4 through 5 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 4 through 5 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Combines two separate Indiana Code provisions concerning the presuit notice required in residential foreclosure proceedings into one section. Repeals one of the provisions being combined. Provides that the presuit notice must inform the debtor that if the creditor obtains a foreclosure judgment, the debtor has a right to do the following before a sheriff's sale is conducted: (1) Appeal a finding of abandonment by a court. (2) Redeem the real estate from the judgment. (3) Retain possession of the property, subject to certain conditions. Provides that an enforcement authority that has issued an abatement order for a vacant or abandoned structure may under certain conditions file a praecipe for the sale of the property with the clerk of the county after 180 days have elapsed from the date a foreclosure judgment and decree is filed, if the party that is entitled to enforce the judgment has not itself filed a praecipe.
Title
Abatement of vacant or abandoned structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Sections 4 through 5 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 3 effective 01/01/2011 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 1 through 2 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 68 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 266: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment 1 (Tallian), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Senators Lanane and Taylor added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-09 | Senator Holdman added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss, Broden and Tallian | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: Yeas 88, Nays 8 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Representative Burton added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-14 | Representative Barnes added as coauthor | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2010-01-07 | Coauthored by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Riecken |