IN HB1119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Receipt of gift by permittee. Removes a provision that increases the penalty for an alcoholic beverage retailer or dealer to accept a gift from an alcoholic beverage manufacturer or other permittee from a Class A misdemeanor to a Level 6 felony if the value of a gift is at least $750.
Title
Receipt of gift by permittee. Removes a provision that increases the penalty for an alcoholic beverage retailer or dealer to accept a gift from an alcoholic beverage manufacturer or other permittee from a Class A misdemeanor to a Level 6 felony if the value of a gift is at least $750.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 64 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 394: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Alting added third sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Young, M. added second sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Steele added first sponsor |
2015-01-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2015-01-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-15 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative Dermody added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |