IN HB1119 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain transactions involving the offer to sell or the sale of securities from security registration requirements. Provides that amounts ordered or identified as restitution are not considered monetary sanctions for purposes of determining the maximum amount the securities commissioner may award to an informant for reporting a securities violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securities law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 111902 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House of Representatives - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House of Representatives - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 111901 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 71
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-02-27SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-02-27SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 258: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-25SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Taylor added as cosponsor.
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology
2014-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 74 and nays 21
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative Riecken added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-23HouseSenator Holdman added as sponsor.
2014-01-21HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-21HouseRepresentative Sullivan added as coauthor.
2014-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-09HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Financial Institutions
2014-01-09HouseCoauthored by Representative Koch
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Heaton.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1119/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/6/8/4e68f419/HB1119.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/7/e/9e7e5f10/HB1119.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/a/8/0ea8eb73/HB1119.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/f/f/ddffacf0/HB1119.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/5/a/135a2e2b/HB1119.04.ENRH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/b/2/cdb2e9b4/HB1119.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/9/f/ab9f5c8a/HB1119.02.COMH.44.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/e/4/64e49413/HB1119.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/a/c/f4ace3bb/HB1119.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/3/c/773c1839/HB1119.03.COMS.258.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback