IN HB1119 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the governing body of a soil and water conservation district to approve payment of certain expenses subject to review and approval at the governing body's next regular meeting. Requires the district's fiscal officer to certify payments.
Title
Soil and water conservation districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 52 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler, R. Young and Lewis | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-12 | Representatives Cheatham, Goodin and Dodge added as coauthors | |
2010-01-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: Yeas 76, Nays 19 | |
2010-01-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Bischoff |