IN HB1118 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 146: Yeas 43, Nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a community organization within whose specific geographic boundaries a nuisance exists to bring an action under the laws governing: (1) general nuisance actions, if the community organization does not interfere with the right of a private individual to bring an action to abate or enjoin a private nuisance; (2) actions for indecent nuisances; and (3) actions for drug nuisances; as applicable. Makes the drug nuisance law consistent with the indecent nuisance law by adding the attorney general to the list of prosecuting officials that may bring an action under the drug nuisance law. Defines "nuisance" for purposes of the unsafe building law. Allows a civil action under the unsafe building law to be initiated before the final date of an order or an extension of an order requiring: (1) the completion; or (2) a substantial beginning toward accomplishing the completion; of the remedial action required by the order. Allows a community organization to initiate a civil action under the unsafe building law if the enforcement authority for the county or municipality has filed a civil action regarding the unsafe premises. (Current law prohibits a community organization from initiating a civil action if the enforcement authority has filed an action.) Provides that a community organization must provide notice of its intention to file a civil action under the unsafe building law at least 30 days (rather than 60 days under current law) before commencing the action. Eliminates the requirement that the notice must be given to the enforcement authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuisance actions by community organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 146: Yeas 43, Nays 56
2010-01-26 Amendment 3 (Foley), failed; Roll Call 65: Yeas 47, Nays 48
2010-01-26 Amendment 2 (Foley), prevailed; Roll Call 64: Yeas 48, Nays 46
2010-01-26 Amendment 4 (Foley), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-26 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-19 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Day

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback