IN HB1116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County, city, and town officer salary waivers. Allows an elected officer of a county, city, or town to waive all or part of the officer's compensation. (Current law allows a town officer to waive all of the officer's compensation.)
Title
County, city, and town officer salary waivers. Allows an elected officer of a county, city, or town to waive all or part of the officer's compensation. (Current law allows a town officer to waive all of the officer's compensation.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Buck |
2017-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 91, nays 6 |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |