IN HB1115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician noncompete agreements. Requires an enforceable physician noncompete agreement to contain the following provisions: (1) A provision that requires the employer of the physician to provide the physician with a copy of any notice: (A) concerning the physician's departure; and (B) sent to any patient seen or treated by the departing physician during the two year period preceding the termination of the physician's employment or expiration of the departing physician's contract, as applicable. (2) A provision that requires the physician's employer to, in good faith, provide current or last known contact and location information to a patient seen or treated by the physician during the two year period preceding the termination of the physician's employment or expiration of the physician's contract. (3) A provision that provides the physician whose employment has terminated or whose contract has expired with the option to purchase a complete and final release from the terms of an enforceable noncompete agreement at a reasonable price. (4) A provision that prohibits medical records from being provided to the physician in a format that differs from the format used to create or store the medical record during the routine and ordinary course of business. Allows the person or entity responsible for copying or transferring a medical record to charge a reasonable fee for the service.
Title
Physician noncompete agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Holdman |
2020-02-03 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Garten, Busch |
2020-02-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed; Roll Call 144: yeas 28, nays 63 |
2020-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Judy added as coauthors |
2020-01-13 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Morris |