IN HB1114 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Representatives Lindauer, Borders, Rowray E, Bartels, Abbott D, King J, Heaton, Morrison, Miller D added as coauthors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

New courts and new magistrates. Allows the judges of the Daviess circuit and superior courts to appoint a full-time magistrate. Allows the judges of the Delaware circuit court to appoint a full-time magistrate. Establishes a second superior court in the Dubois County judicial district. Allows the judges of the Elkhart circuit and superior courts to appoint four full-time magistrates (effective July 1, 2023) and two additional full-time magistrates beginning January 1, 2024. (Current law allows for the appointment of two magistrates.) Allows the judge of the Spencer circuit court to appoint a magistrate. Allows Vigo superior court to appoint six judges. (Current law allows for the appointment of five judges.) Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New courts and new magistrates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30HouseRepresentatives Lindauer, Borders, Rowray E, Bartels, Abbott D, King J, Heaton, Morrison, Miller D added as coauthors
2023-01-30HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2023-01-19HouseRepresentative Prescott added as coauthor
2023-01-19HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2023-01-19HouseRepresentative Errington added as coauthor
2023-01-19HouseRepresentative Wesco added as coauthor
2023-01-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2023-01-19HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-01-17HouseRepresentative Pfaff added as coauthor
2023-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2023-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Torr

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback