IN HB1114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal matters. Provides that a person commits interfering with law enforcement, a Class B misdemeanor, if, after being denied entry by a law enforcement officer, the person enters an area that is marked off with barrier tape or other physical barriers. Provides a defense if the person enters the prohibited area due to a reasonable belief that certain family members were injured or were at risk of injury. Increases the penalty if the person uses a vehicle, draws or uses a deadly weapon, or causes injury or death to another person. Provides that resisting or interfering with law enforcement is enhanced to a Level 6 felony if the person uses a vehicle to commit the offense. (Under current law, the felony enhancement to resisting law enforcement applies only if the person flees from law enforcement using a vehicle.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal matters. Provides that a person commits interfering with law enforcement, a Class B misdemeanor, if, after being denied entry by a law enforcement officer, the person enters an area that is marked off with barrier tape or other physical barriers. Provides a defense if the person enters the prohibited area due to a reasonable belief that certain family members were injured or were at risk of injury. Increases the penalty if the person uses a vehicle, draws or uses a deadly weapon, or causes injury or death to another person. Provides that resisting or interfering with law enforcement is enhanced to a Level 6 felony if the person uses a vehicle to commit the offense. (Under current law, the felony enhancement to resisting law enforcement applies only if the person flees from law enforcement using a vehicle.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 201
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 584: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 603: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-15SenateSenator Rogers added as advisor
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Young M, Randolph Lonnie M and Doriot
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
2019-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: McNamara, Bartels, Beck and Hatcher
2019-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Miller D and Pierce
2019-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 399: yeas 39, nays 10
2019-04-04SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Doriot added as third sponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Houchin added as second sponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Rogers removed as third sponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Doriot removed as second sponsor
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #1 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #4 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-26SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-02-15HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-14HouseRepresentative Wesco added as coauthor
2019-02-14HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Head, Doriot and Rogers
2019-02-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 92, nays 2
2019-02-12HouseAmendment #4 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-12HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Bartels added as coauthor
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Miller D

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1114/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/9/2/4f92e4a7/HB1114.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/c/f/2acffae1/HB1114.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/4/c/8e4ccfdf/HB1114.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/2/4/2d24869d/HB1114.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/5/b/675b0a76/HB1114.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/c/c/14cc3b60/HB1114.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/a/f/c6af09d7/HB1114.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/a/4/f3a429cf/HB1114.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/a/0/a6a01b9b/HB1114.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/1/7/c6175ae1/HB1114.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/8/3/2083bc6c/HB1114.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/d/2/9ad21dd7/HB1114.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/f/4/6ef4bcbc/HB1114.172.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/1/5/7a15ff1c/HB1114.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/b/c/6bbc5fca/HB1114.399.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/c/c/6cccfbdb/HB1114.584.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/e/a/faea86a9/HB1114.603.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback