IN HB1114 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senator Bray added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senator Bray added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows optometrists who are certified by the optometry board to administer, dispense, and prescribe certain narcotic drugs, codeine with compounds, and hydrocodone with compounds. Repeals a law concerning drug formulary requirements. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Legend drug prescriptions by optometrists.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Patrick Bauer [D] |
Sen. Richard Bray [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 111401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 111401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senator Bray added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 86 and nays 8 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Grooms added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson. |