IN HB1112 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid reimbursement rates. Requires, beginning July 1, 2023, the office of the secretary of family and social services (office of the secretary) and a managed care organization to reimburse under Medicaid an emergency medical services provider organization that is a Medicaid provider at a rate comparable to the federal Medicare reimbursement rate for the service. Specifies that the Medicaid reimbursement methodology for payments to out of state children's hospitals must factor in any cost outlier case in a manner that results in the final reimbursement rate made to a hospital meeting the specified reimbursement requirements. Allows the office to make retroactive reimbursement payments for out of state children's hospitals upon factoring in any cost outlier case.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Public Law 142 |
2022-03-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 367: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 381: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Qaddoura |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Melton |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Brown T, Barrett and DeLaney |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Slager and Andrade |
2022-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer and Ford Jon |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Amendment #2 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor |
2022-01-12 | House | Representative Judy added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Andrade |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |