IN HB1111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highway extension and research program. Provides that local officials are required to attend any school or course conducted for local officials within the first two years of their initial term, but may (rather than shall) attend any school or course conducted for local officials after initial attendance. Provides that the county fiscal body shall appropriate sufficient funds to pay local officials a per diem for expenses for each day or part of a day the member is in attendance at any school or course conducted for local officials, and mileage at a rate determined by the county fiscal body for each mile traveled to attend the school.
Title
Highway extension and research program.
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Public Law 18 |
2021-04-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second sponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2021-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lindauer |