IN HB1110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Survivor health coverage. Provides that, if the employer of a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty after June 30, 2018, offers health coverage for active employees, the employer shall offer to provide and pay for health coverage under the plan covering active employees for the surviving spouse and each natural child, stepchild, and adopted child of the public safety officer. Provides that health coverage for a surviving child continues: (1) until the child becomes 18 years of age; (2) until the child becomes 23 years of age, if the child is: (A) enrolled in and regularly
Title
Survivor health coverage. Provides that, if the employer of a public safety officer who dies in the line of duty after June 30, 2018, offers health coverage for active employees, the employer shall offer to provide and pay for health coverage under the plan covering active employees for the surviving spouse and each natural child, stepchild, and adopted child of the public safety officer. Provides that health coverage for a surviving child continues: (1) until the child becomes 18 years of age; (2) until the child becomes 23 years of age, if the child is: (A) enrolled in and regularly
Sponsors
Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Niezgodski |
2018-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Representatives Carbaugh, Forestal, Bacon added as coauthors |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Macer |