IN HB1109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Amendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - Amendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wholesale pricing of nonalcoholic beverages. Prohibits, with certain exceptions, a supplier of nonalcoholic packaged beverages (supplier) from discriminating among retailers as to a delivery method, price, discount, allowance, or service charge. Specifies restrictions concerning: (1) a distribution agreement to which a supplier is a party; (2) means of delivery; (3) communication by a supplier; and (4) the purchase and sale of beverages from one retailer to another.
Title
Wholesale pricing of nonalcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Austin) failed (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Austin) motion withdrawn |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #2 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 129: yeas 30, nays 64 |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #9 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Hatcher added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2022-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Steuerwald |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |