IN HB1109 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Telephone solicitation and consumer credit. Amends the law requiring telemarketers to register with the office of the attorney general (registration law) as follows: (1) Provides that a seller is not subject to the registration law solely because the seller makes or will make a solicitation in a telephone call that is exempt from the Do Not Call statute. (2) Restores conditions removed by P.L.242-2019 that limit application of the registration law to sellers that make certain types of solicitations. (3) Provides that a solicitation occurs for purposes of the registration law only in a telephone call made by a seller. (4) Removes the requirement that a seller must provide in the seller's registration statement information as to whether the seller (or any officer, director, trustee, general partner, manager, principal, executive, or representative of the seller) has been: (A) held liable in certain civil actions; (B) convicted of certain crimes during the most recent seven years; or (C) declared bankrupt during the most recent seven years. Repeals from the statute governing consumer sales the chapter that sets forth certain requirements for a consumer reporting agency that uses a Social Security number as a factor in determining whether a file maintained by the consumer reporting agency matches the identity of an individual who is the subject of a credit inquiry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone solicitation and consumer credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 105
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseRepresentatives Ellington, Lauer, Hatfield added as coauthors
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1109/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/e/8/c3e8d853/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/3/e/023eb538/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/2/b/212bd0d0/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/b/0/4cb053ec/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/a/e/7caefcc5/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/d/5/44d5fe2f/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/0/6/330680d3/HB1109.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/0/e/270ed96e/HB1109.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/0/5/f605040f/HB1109.46_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/8/2/d8826a5f/HB1109.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/6/0/2c60d451/HB1109.223_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback