IN HB1109 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various pension matters. Provides that the default investment option for the legislators' defined contribution plan is a target date fund rather than the Indiana public retirement system's (INPRS) consolidated retirement investment fund. Removes a requirement that only active members of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) and the Indiana teachers' retirement fund (TRF) may make rollover distributions into annuity savings accounts (ASA) from other qualified retirement accounts. Allows any PERF or TRF member who terminates employment and is not currently employed in a covered position or for the same employer to suspend fund membership, retain the member's creditable service, and

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various pension matters. Provides that the default investment option for the legislators' defined contribution plan is a target date fund rather than the Indiana public retirement system's (INPRS) consolidated retirement investment fund. Removes a requirement that only active members of the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) and the Indiana teachers' retirement fund (TRF) may make rollover distributions into annuity savings accounts (ASA) from other qualified retirement accounts. Allows any PERF or TRF member who terminates employment and is not currently employed in a covered position or for the same employer to suspend fund membership, retain the member's creditable service, and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HousePublic Law 179
2018-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 368: yeas 81, nays 0
2018-03-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2018-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Walker and Niezgodski
2018-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Boots and Tallian
2018-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Burton, Lyness and Taylor J
2018-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Moseley
2018-03-01HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2018-03-01HouseMotion to dissent filed
2018-02-21SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2018-02-20SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 49, nays 0
2018-02-19SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2018-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2018-01-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-01-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Boots
2018-01-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 94, nays 0
2018-01-18HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2018-01-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2018-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representative Burton
2018-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1109/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/7/b/f67b79b9/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/8/c/e78c2141/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/1/4/491477a5/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/f/5/5bf569e4/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/0/0/b000dfbf/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/f/3/84f34d48/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/f/6/2ef602a5/HB1109.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/2/4/5024d019/HB1109.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/0/c/c00c9de7/HB1109.29.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/3/1cd36d74/HB1109.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/9/0/16909adc/HB1109.212.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/0/2/72022aff/HB1109.368.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback