IN HB1109 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that all locations (other than the circuit court clerk's office) where a voter is entitled to cast in person an absentee ballot before election day must meet the same accessibility requirements that apply to a polling place for a precinct. Provides that a voter casting an absentee ballot before an absentee voter board in the office of the circuit court clerk or at a satellite office is entitled to receive assistance in casting a ballot if the voter is a voter with a disability or is unable to read or write English. Provides that a voter with a disability who votes an absentee ballot (other than a voter who casts an absentee ballot before an absentee voter board that visits the voter's residence or place of confinement) is entitled to vote on a direct record electronic voting system. Provides that a county election board may count absentee ballots cast at the clerk's office or at a satellite office on a direct record electronic voting system at a central location instead of sending those ballots to the precinct for counting. Requires a county election board that counts absentee ballots in this manner to adjust precinct vote totals to reflect the counting of these absentee ballots. Provides that a county that counts these absentee ballots in this fashion is not required to count other absentee ballots at a central location. Provides that absentee ballots cast at the clerk's office or at a satellite office on a direct record electronic voting system shall be counted using the procedures for counting absentee ballots at a central location, including the procedures for challenging absentee ballots and eliminating the absentee ballots of individuals voting in person at the polls, to assure that the ballots cast on the direct record electronic voting system may be counted. Implements the Military and Overseas Voter Empowerment Act ("MOVE") in Indiana election law. Delegates to counties the state's responsibilities to carry out the requirements of MOVE except as otherwise provided by law. Designates electronic mail, fax, and web publication as means of communications for an absent uniformed services voter or an overseas voter to request a voter registration application and an absentee ballot application. Requires the secretary of state, with the approval of the election division, to develop a free access system that permits an absent uniformed services voter or overseas voter to determine whether the voter's absentee ballot has been received by the appropriate county election board (or board of elections and registration), regardless of the manner in which the absentee ballot was transmitted by the voter to the board. Increases from 40 days to 74 days before the date of a general election the deadline for challenging the qualifications of a candidate who seeks an office on the general election ballot. Provides that if a challenge is not resolved by noon 60 days before the general election, the challenge is terminated and the name of a challenged candidate may not be removed from the ballot. Provides that, if an absent uniformed services voter or an overseas voter makes a timely application for and does not receive an absentee ballot from a county election board, the voter may use a federal write-in absentee ballot in the form prescribed by the Federal Voting Assistance Program of the United States Department of Defense to cast a vote for any candidate, political party, or public question on a primary election, general election, municipal election, or special election ballot. Establishes rules for counting federal write-in absentee ballots. Updates outdated voter registration provisions. Repeals superseded statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voters with disabilities; MOVE.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 66
2010-03-17 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 287: Yeas 89, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 265: Yeas 47, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-02 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-01 Senate advisors appointed: Lawson, Errington and Schneider
2010-03-01 Senate conferee appointed: Miller and Broden
2010-02-25 House advisors appointed: Barnes, Yarde and M. Smith
2010-02-25 House conferees appointed: Battles and Richardson
2010-02-25 House dissented from Senate amendments
2010-02-25 Returned to the House with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-24 Amendment 3 (Walker), withdrawn
2010-02-24 Amendment 6 (Miller), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 5 (Miller), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-22 Placed back on second reading
2010-02-18 Amendment 2 (Miller), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-18 Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-18 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Senator Lawson added as second sponsor
2010-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-11 Senators Broden and Errington added as cosponsors
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2010-01-12 Senate sponsor: Senator Miller
2010-01-12 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: Yeas 97, Nays 0
2010-01-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-07 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2010-01-05 Coauthored by Representatives Richardson and Barnes
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Battles

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback