IN HB1109 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

INSPECT program reporting. Provides that a dispenser who is also authorized to prescribe ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, or a controlled substance is required only to report to the Indiana scheduled prescription electronic collection and tracking (INSPECT) program actual dispensations within 24 hours of the dispensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSPECT program reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublic Law 17
2021-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-09SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 46, nays 1
2021-03-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-04SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-02-16HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-15HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Doriot
2021-02-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 91, nays 0
2021-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-09HouseRepresentative Barrett added as coauthor
2021-02-09HouseRepresentative Miller added as coauthor
2021-02-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Bartels

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1109/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/1/f/351ff385/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/3/d/b53d9d45/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/a/0/1da0cca1/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/0/b/cc0b9185/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/4/1/4841767d/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/8/0/c7800301/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/3/a/773a90b4/HB1109.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/6/3/21635047/HB1109.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/1/1/c01177e1/HB1109.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/f/d/bdfdbe64/HB1109.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/9/d/4a9dd769/HB1109.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/2/5/5d2541aa/HB1109.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/b/1/e5b1f8e9/HB1109.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/a/3/1ba3601f/HB1109.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/4/5/544520c7/HB1109.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/e/3/d8e3ee02/HB1109.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/9/9/8999d106/HB1109.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/7/e/5a7efe7f/HB1109.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/1/e/fa1ed6b3/HB1109.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/d/dd7dfede/HB1109.121_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/1/3/e813937f/HB1109.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/0/8/6f08d1aa/HB1109.214_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback