IN HB1108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State board of accounts. Makes various changes to statutes concerning the state board of accounts (board). Adds a definition of a "responsible officer of an audited entity". Allows the audit committee to determine the amount of the bond for the state examiner, deputy examiners, and field examiners based on applicable risk considerations. Repeals a statute that addresses duties required by law on April 5, 1909. Provides that, for purposes of the risk based examination criteria, the board may perform examinations of certain audited entities more frequently than once every four years if required by a ratings agency that rates debt maintained by such an audited entity. Provides that the board may issue management letters based on professional auditing standards to certain audited entities. Provides that the state examiner, deputy examiner, or field examiner may issue subpoenas to enforce the filing of certain reports. Establishes a procedure governing the examination of certain bodies corporate and politic. Provides that the procedure applies only to a body corporate and politic whose enabling statute does not provide for an audit, examination, or other engagement by the state board of accounts or an independent public accounting firm concerning financial or compliance related matters of the body corporate and politic. Makes changes to statutes establishing the forfeiture of office for the failure to file certain reports, interference with an examiner, and the failure to adopt or use the system of accounting and reporting adopted by the board. Provides that, as an alternative to an order to forfeit office, a court may impose a civil penalty that does not exceed $500 for each day that the public officer or responsible officer continues to violate an obligation with respect to an audit, examination, or other engagement by the board. Specifies that the individual is personally liable for a civil penalty imposed on the individual for such a violation. Provides that the board may collect the expenses from the audited entity that the board incurs in carrying out the audit, examination, or other engagement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State board of accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 157
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 395: yeas 43, nays 6
2020-03-11HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 392: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-11SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-11HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Spartz and Tallian
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bassler and Niezgodski
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Barrett, Negele, Campbell and Hamilton
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehman and Porter
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 47, nays 3
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #4 (Stoops) failed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #8 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-30HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bassler and Spartz
2020-01-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 118: yeas 32, nays 61
2020-01-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Lehman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1108/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/0/b/520b645b/HB1108.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/6/b/f46b1ef0/HB1108.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/5/d/7d5df756/HB1108.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/3/7/bf37e3ac/HB1108.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/4/2/09424aa0/HB1108.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/c/4/40c4881b/HB1108.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/d/b/4cdb0498/HB1108.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/d/c/56dca702/HB1108.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/d/e/74de0ae4/HB1108.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/f/7/99f7ba56/HB1108.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/0/4/be0493ce/HB1108.118_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/0/9/1409b60f/HB1108.140_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/a/cc2a4197/HB1108.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/7/2/d8728ab5/HB1108.285_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/6/e/4e6e7752/HB1108.392_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/5/6/3f56cf0f/HB1108.395_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback