IN HB1108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 54-17)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 54-17)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dyslexia. Defines "dyslexia". Requires teacher training programs to prepare teachers to recognize that a student who is not progressing at a normal rate related to reading may need to be referred to the school's multidisciplinary team to determine the student's special learning needs, including learning needs related to dyslexia. Provides that if an education service center offers inservice training or other teacher training programs, the education service center may offer courses for teachers on dyslexia characteristics and appropriate interventions.
Title
Dyslexia. Defines "dyslexia". Requires teacher training programs to prepare teachers to recognize that a student who is not progressing at a normal rate related to reading may need to be referred to the school's multidisciplinary team to determine the student's special learning needs, including learning needs related to dyslexia. Provides that if an education service center offers inservice training or other teacher training programs, the education service center may offer courses for teachers on dyslexia characteristics and appropriate interventions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Public Law 215 |
2015-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 508: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-04-23 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 521: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete, Rogers and Miller Patricia |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Bray and Stoops |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Cook, Summers and Austin |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Burton and Riecken |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Walker added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senators Becker, Alting, Banks A added as cosponsors |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senator Ford added as cosponsor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Leising added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Tomes added as cosponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senators Stoops and Mrvan added as cosponsor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pete added as third sponsor |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | House | Senator Bray added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-03 | House | Representatives Truitt, Goodin, Smith, V., Mayfield, DeVon, Bauer, Fine, Hamm, Friend, Slager, Behning, Harris, Steuerwald, Beumer, Niezgodski, Koch, Cherry, Harman, Morrison, Lucas, Cox, McNamara, Culver, Bartlett, Bacon, Zent, Frizzell, Mahan, Dermody, Soliday, Forestal, Price, Aylesworth, Wesco, Miller added as coauthors |
2015-02-03 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #1 (Burton) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Representatives Kirchhofer, Eberhart, Leonard, Ubelhor, Rhoads, Braun added as coauthors |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Baird added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Errington added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative Schaibley and Cook added as coauthors |
2015-01-26 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2015-01-26 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representatives Clere, Austin, Negele, Macer added as coauthorss |
2015-01-20 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-01-15 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Burton |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |