IN HB1107 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology
Pending: Senate Utilities & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that: (1) a municipality that operates a water utility; or (2) users of the waterworks located outside the corporate boundaries of the municipality; may petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) under certain circumstances for review and revision of the rates and charges imposed on the users. Requires the IURC to prescribe the form and content of the petition. Provides that a petition is deemed approved if the IURC does not approve or disapprove the petition within 120 days. Authorizes the IURC to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IURC review of certain water rates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology
2010-02-02 Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Deig
2010-02-02 Referred to the Senate
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: Yeas 86, Nays 10
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-26 Representatives Frizzell and Lutz added as coauthors
2010-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-20 Representative Thompson added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Battles

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback