IN HB1104 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial examinations and the state board of accounts. Permits the state board of accounts to determine the frequency with which the state board of accounts conducts financial examinations based on risk based criteria approved by the audit and financial reporting subcommittee of the legislative council. Eliminates the requirement that the state examiner must annually furnish forms and instructions to reporting officers. Specifies that certain examinations by the state board of accounts may (rather than must, under current law) be made without notice. Provides that the state board of accounts may only release examination workpapers and investigation records to certain persons.
Title
Financial examinations and the state board of accounts. Permits the state board of accounts to determine the frequency with which the state board of accounts conducts financial examinations based on risk based criteria approved by the audit and financial reporting subcommittee of the legislative council. Eliminates the requirement that the state examiner must annually furnish forms and instructions to reporting officers. Specifies that certain examinations by the state board of accounts may (rather than must, under current law) be made without notice. Provides that the state board of accounts may only release examination workpapers and investigation records to certain persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] |
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 181 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 548: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 574: yeas 88, nays 6 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Breaux and Raatz |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Head and Randolph |
2015-04-16 | House | House Advisors appointed: Mahan, Harman, Bartlett and Errington |
2015-04-16 | House | House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Riecken |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 343: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Senator Head added as sponsor |
2015-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 79, nays 18 |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #3 (Goodin) motion withdrawn |
2015-02-03 | House | Amendment #4 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative Mahan added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |