IN HB1104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Indiana department of transportation to contract with a third party for a study of alternative funding mechanisms for the maintenance of Indiana's transportation infrastructure.
Title
Alternative transportation funding mechanisms.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 110402 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Floor - (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 110401 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 110402 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Floor - (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 110401 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Public Law 208 |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 414: yeas 86 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 294: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 93 and nays 1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Wyss added as sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Banks added as 2nd sponsor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Arnold added as 3rd sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Forestal), failed; Roll Call 27: yeas 31 and nays 64 |
2014-01-21 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative Stemler added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative Smaltz added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday. |