IN HB1102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Patent protection. Prohibits a person from asserting a claim of patent infringement in bad faith. Provides that a court may, upon motion, require a person to post a bond if the target establishes a reasonable likelihood that the person has made an assertion of patent infringement in bad faith. Establishes remedies and damages. Exempts certain: (1) approved postsecondary educational institutions; (2) technology transfer organizations owned by or affiliated with approved postsecondary educational institutions; and (3) licensees holding patents from postsecondary educational institutions or technology transfer organizations owned by or affiliated with postsecondary educational institutions; from the provisions regarding bad faith
Title
Patent protection. Prohibits a person from asserting a claim of patent infringement in bad faith. Provides that a court may, upon motion, require a person to post a bond if the target establishes a reasonable likelihood that the person has made an assertion of patent infringement in bad faith. Establishes remedies and damages. Exempts certain: (1) approved postsecondary educational institutions; (2) technology transfer organizations owned by or affiliated with approved postsecondary educational institutions; and (3) licensees holding patents from postsecondary educational institutions or technology transfer organizations owned by or affiliated with postsecondary educational institutions; from the provisions regarding bad faith
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Casey Cox [R] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Public Law 172 |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 547: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 573: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Bray and Lanane |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Steele and Taylor |
2015-04-16 | House | House Advisors appointed: VanNatter, Cox, Bauer and DeLaney |
2015-04-16 | House | House Conferees appointed: Koch and Hale |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-14 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 393: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senator Head added as second sponsor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Civil Law |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | Senator Steele added as sponsor |
2015-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Representative Cox added as coauthor |
2015-01-22 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |