IN HB1100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a Class A misdemeanor for a person incarcerated in a county jail to possess a cellular telephone or other wireless or cellular communications device.
Title
Inmate possession of a cellular device prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 51 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: Yeas 46 and Nays 4 | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-01-25 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Lewis | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: Yeas 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Representative Barnes added as coauthor | |
2010-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | Representatives Tincher and Michael added as coauthors | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Goodin |