IN HB1099 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 01/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the board of animal health to assist organizations that represent poultry producers with issues related to poultry. Allows the board to adopt rules to establish standards governing the care of livestock and poultry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards for livestock and poultry care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 01/01/2011
2010-03-25 Public Law 50
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-08 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-01 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-25 Signed by the Speaker
2010-02-22 Returned to the House without amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-15 Senators Charbonneau and Randolph added as cosponsors
2010-02-11 Senator Errington added as cosponsor
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
2010-01-25 Cosponsor: Senator Gard
2010-01-25 Senate sponsors: Senators Head, Deig and Steele
2010-01-25 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: Yeas 94, Nays 0
2010-01-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-19 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-12 Representatives Ruppel and Pearson added as coauthors
2010-01-07 Representative Friend added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Goodin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback