IN HB1097 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Amendment #2 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Advanced practice registered nurses. Allows an advanced practice registered nurse who: (1) had primary responsibility for the treatment and care of a deceased individual for a period longer than six months; and (2) pronounced the time of death for the deceased individual; to enter or sign a record on a death into the Indiana death registration system. Specifies "practitioner" for purposes of a practice agreement with an advanced practice registered nurse. Sets forth requirements that must be met in order for an advanced practice registered nurse to operate without a practice agreement. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to report to the general assembly before October 1, 2019. Makes a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced practice registered nurses. Allows an advanced practice registered nurse who: (1) had primary responsibility for the treatment and care of a deceased individual for a period longer than six months; and (2) pronounced the time of death for the deceased individual; to enter or sign a record on a death into the Indiana death registration system. Specifies "practitioner" for purposes of a practice agreement with an advanced practice registered nurse. Sets forth requirements that must be met in order for an advanced practice registered nurse to operate without a practice agreement. Requires the Indiana state board of nursing to report to the general assembly before October 1, 2019. Makes a conforming change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #2 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-14HouseRepresentatives Lindauer and Austin added as coauthors
2019-01-10HouseRepresentative Kirchhofer added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback