IN HB1097 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Senator Steele added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the professional licensing agency to maintain a registry of certain persons licensed to provide health care who intend to provide voluntary health care services. Grants certain persons licensed to provide health care services immunity from liability for an act or omission relating to the provision of health care if: (1) the person is licensed to provide health care; (2) the care was provided voluntarily and without compensation; (3) the person providing the care provides notice of immunity; and (4) the person providing health care is on the registry maintained by the professional licensing agency. Specifies that immunity for providing: (1) dental services is available if the dental services are provided in a dental office or elsewhere; and (2) nondental health care services is only available if the nondental health care services are provided in a setting other than a medical clinic, health care facility, or permanent facility whose primary purpose is the provision of health care services. Provides that the immunity for certain health care providers is not available if the health care provider provided substandard care or committed gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct. Grants immunity from health care related claims to certain owners, operators, lessors, and lessees who make their real property available for the provision of voluntary health care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunity for providing volunteer health care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 109703 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 109701 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05SenateSenator Steele added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Lanane added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Pete Miller added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Arnold added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Pat Miller added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Koch added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Zent added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Hale added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Frizzell added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 293: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-03-04SenateSenator Merritt added third sponsor.
2014-03-03SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor.
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Civil Law
2014-02-03HouseSenator Pete Miller added as second sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseSenator Pat Miller added as sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 179: yeas 86 and nays 4
2014-01-30HouseHB 1097 Amendment #1 (Koch), prevailed.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-30HouseRepresentative Koch added as coauthor.
2014-01-30HouseRepresentative Hale added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-16HouseRepresentative Zent added as coauthor.
2014-01-09HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Frizzell.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1097/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/7/6/5b76b049/HB1097.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/c/5/6bc53894/HB1097.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/7/2/5b7200f9/HB1097.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/e/621e9e3f/HB1097.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/a/14aaba65/HB1097.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/3/1/b13148a0/HB1097.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/b/d/37bde4fa/HB1097.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/b/f2ab9d30/HB1097.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/6/4/ea64f9d5/HB1097.03.ENGH.179.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/3/a/073a3269/HB1097.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/4/f/644fb6df/HB1097.04.COMS.293.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback