IN HB1095 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Trespassing and aggressive harassment. Establishes the low barrier homeless task force. Provides that a person commits the offense of criminal trespass if: (1) the person, who does not have a contractual interest in the property, knowingly or intentionally enters or refuses to leave the property of another person after having been prohibited from entering or asked to leave the property by a law enforcement officer when the property is designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be an unsafe building or premises; or (2) the person knowingly or intentionally enters the property of another person after being denied entry by a court order that has been issued to the person or issued to the general public by conspicuous posting on or around the premises in areas where a person can observe the order when the property has been designated by a municipality or county enforcement authority to be an unsafe building or premises; unless the person has the written permission of the owner, the owner's agent, an enforcement authority, or a court to come onto the property for purposes of performing maintenance, repair, or demolition. Provides that an individual who harasses another person with the intent to obtain property from the other person commits aggressive harassment, a Class C misdemeanor. Defines "harasses". Repeals the chapter concerning panhandling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trespassing and aggressive harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Taylor G, Walker K
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 92, nays 2
2021-02-18HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #2 (Moed) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2021-02-17HouseRepresentative Torr added as coauthor
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Moed

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1095/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/3/7/8b375df5/HB1095.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/7/c/107c5d96/HB1095.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/8/4/7a848e62/HB1095.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/d/e/e5de096c/HB1095.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/4/1/bb41af38/HB1095.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/6/5/e1653623/HB1095.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/3/e/7b3ed4d0/HB1095.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/8/7/71874aba/HB1095.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/8/e3a8b707/HB1095.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/3/0/9330901f/HB1095.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/c/8/c3c83134/HB1095.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/6/2/b86250fb/HB1095.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/d/3/f6d35bf0/HB1095.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/d/c2fde8a7/HB1095.231_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback