IN HB1094 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substance use prevention and recovery. Requires the executive director of the Indiana criminal justice institute to work with local coordinating councils and other stakeholders when implementing certain recommendations concerning substance use and substance use disorder. Includes public safety programs in the statutory definition of "criminal justice services and activities". Specifies that local coordinating councils responsible for the combating of drug and substance use are: (1) collaborative; and (2) open to the public. Permits county drug free community funds to supplement local government spending on: (1) drug use recovery programs; (2) drug use intervention programs; and (3) drug use prevention programs. Defines certain terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance use prevention and recovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 40
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Leising added as third sponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Merritt added as second sponsor
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-25SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Forestal added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Fleming added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseRepresentatives Macer and Vermilion A added as coauthors
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Ziemke

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1094/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/7/4/77746a6e/HB1094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/e/2/81e218c3/HB1094.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/8/e/228eb062/HB1094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/0/b/c80b73a4/HB1094.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/d/f/dedf4a64/HB1094.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/d/2/1cd2d429/HB1094.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/9/2/a5922249/HB1094.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/7/7/bd77cd22/HB1094.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/a/0/76a05c23/HB1094.44_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/7/7/df776b2d/HB1094.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/8/d/568dbfe0/HB1094.284_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback