IN HB1093 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Representative Klinker added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Amends the membership and duties of the early learning advisory committee. Makes changes to the definition of "school resource officer". Provides that, after June 30, 2023, if a school corporation or charter school enters into a contract for a school resource officer, certain school corporations or charter schools must enter into a memorandum of understanding with the law enforcement agency that employs or appointed the law enforcement officer who will perform the duties of a school resource officer. Provides that certain parties are prohibited from incentivizing the enrollment, reenrollment, or continued attendance of a student or prospective student by offering or giving an item that has monetary value. Requires the Indiana charter school board (board) to appoint an executive director to carry out the duties and daily operations of the board. Establishes the executive director's duties. Provides that the board shall establish certain processes. Establishes the Indiana charter school board fund and provides that money in the fund is appropriated continuously for purposes of the board. Provides that the department of education (department) may grant an accomplished practitioner's license under certain conditions. Provides that the instructional days tuition support distribution formula account for certain schools within a school corporation. Authorizes the department to study and, if recommended, use machine scoring. Changes the department's review period for certain funds. Repeals a provision concerning staffing of the board. Provides that the state board of education shall assign to a school or school corporation (including adult high schools) a "null" or "no letter grade" for the 2021-2022 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2022-01-13HouseRepresentatives Davis M and Pfaff added as coauthors
2022-01-13HouseAmendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-10HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2022-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1093/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/c/797c9eb7/HB1093.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/0/f/ca0f671f/HB1093.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/c/5/40c53642/HB1093.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/4/3/c3438f42/HB1093.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/1/9/131998af/HB1093.03.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/2/9/fe2987ec/HB1093.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/3/8/a43880a3/HB1093.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/d/a/c8da5dce/HB1093.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/6/2/c3622e2d/HB1093.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/f/5/94f57f4f/HB1093.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/8/9/d18912b7/HB1093.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/a/8/0ba818ad/HB1093.01.INTR.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback