IN HB1093 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Information concerning certain disabilities. Requires the state department of health to collect certain information to be disseminated by health care facilities and health care providers to parents who receive prenatal test results for Down syndrome or any other condition diagnosed prenatally.
Title
Information concerning certain disabilities. Requires the state department of health to collect certain information to be disseminated by health care facilities and health care providers to parents who receive prenatal test results for Down syndrome or any other condition diagnosed prenatally.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 63 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 466: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 326: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senators Brown L, Crider, Becker, Mishler added as cosponsors |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Breaux added as third sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Grooms added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | Representatives Clere, Mayfield, Shackleford added as coauthorss |
2015-01-20 | House | Representative Mayfield removed as coauthor |
2015-01-13 | House | Representative Mayfield added as coauthor |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon |