IN HB1092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a fourth judge to the Johnson superior court as of January 1, 2015. Prohibits the auditor of state from paying the part of the total salary and benefits that would otherwise be paid by the state for the fourth judge of the Johnson superior court until the auditor of state receives a resolution of the board of county commissioners of Johnson County that sets forth the board's determination that a building in existence on January 1, 2012, has been rehabilitated and is ready as a place for the new court to hold sessions. Provides that the Wabash city court has concurrent jurisdiction with the Wabash circuit court in civil cases in which the amount in controversy does not exceed $1,500.
Title
Johnson superior court and Wabash city court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 377: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 331: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-08 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisor appointed: Waltz and Broden | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Randolph | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Steuerwald and White | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Burton and Pryor | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Representative Foley added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 131: yeas 92, nays 0 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative Steuerwald | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Burton |