IN HB1091 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education benefits relating to military service. Provides that a student meets the residency requirements for enrollment at a public school if a parent of the student: (1) is transferred to or is pending transfer to a military installation within Indiana while on active duty pursuant to an official military order; and (2) submits to the public school certain information, including official documentation, as determined by the state board of education, regarding the transfer or pending transfer. Provides that the student is considered to have legal settlement in the attendance area of the school corporation in which the parent: (1) has submitted the required application and documentation; and (2) intends to reside. Requires a parent who is transferred to or is pending transfer to a military installation within Indiana to provide proof of residence to the public school not later than 10 instructional days after the arrival date provided on the required documentation. Provides that if the parent of the student fails to provide the proof of residence, the public school may exclude the student from attendance pending an expulsion proceeding. Makes the following changes to provisions concerning resident tuition rate eligibility for active duty armed forces personnel and dependents of active duty armed forces personnel: (1) Defines "dependent". (2) Amends the definition of "qualified course". (3) Provides that spouses of active duty armed forces personnel are eligible for the resident tuition rate. (4) Provides that spouses and dependents of active duty armed forces personnel are eligible, from the date that the state educational institution accepts the spouse or dependent for enrollment, for the resident tuition rate if the spouse or dependent enrolls in the state educational institution within a certain amount of time. (5) Provides that a dependent or spouse of a person who serves on active duty in the armed forces is eligible for the resident tuition rate for the duration of the spouse's or dependent's continuous enrollment at a state educational institution regardless of whether the person serving on active duty continues, after the spouse or dependent is accepted for enrollment in the state educational institution, to satisfy certain resident rate tuition eligibility criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education benefits relating to military service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 38
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 305: yeas 91, nays 0
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 46, nays 0
2020-02-25SenateAmendment #2 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateSenator Spartz added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenators Mrvan, Donato, Leising, Rogers, Buchanan, Sandlin added as cosponsors
2020-02-17SenateSenator Crane added as third sponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kruse
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseRepresentatives Lindauer, Judy, Bartels added as coauthors
2020-01-13HouseRepresentative Ellington removed as coauthor
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Ellington added as coauthor
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1091/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/8/3/ff83f311/HB1091.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/e/9/6fe96707/HB1091.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/a/6/33a6b7e5/HB1091.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/f/0/fdf01914/HB1091.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/1/4/971451d9/HB1091.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/4/3/9c431b4c/HB1091.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/5/8/d3586925/HB1091.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/5/0/5550a55f/HB1091.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/0/2/e402f0c5/HB1091.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/a/2/58a2bb18/HB1091.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/c/b/97cbed04/HB1091.43_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/0/0/d500b259/HB1091.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/4/e/724ecd04/HB1091.253_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/8/e/458e8931/HB1091.305_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback