IN HB1091 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if a court finds that the prosecution or defense of a nuisance action brought against an agricultural operation was frivolous, the court shall award court costs and reasonable attorney's fees to the prevailing party. Specifies that reasonable attorney's fees may only include the fees for one attorney, and must be calculated on the basis of the reasonable and customary hourly rates charged in the county in which the action was brought. Provides that the determination that an action was frivolous may not be based on the mere fact that a party did not prevail. Requires a court to order a person who manufactures: (1) methamphetamine; or (2) marijuana; on property owned by another to pay certain liquidated damages as restitution to the property owner.
Title
Agricultural operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-13 - House - House - Motion to recommit to Committee on Judiciary (DeLaney): failed (Y: 32 N: 53 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-13 - House - House - Motion to recommit to Committee on Judiciary (DeLaney): failed (Y: 32 N: 53 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 332: yeas 58, nays 35 | |
2012-02-29 | Senator Hershman added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-29 | Senator Buck added as third sponsor | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 36 and nays 14 | |
2012-02-28 | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Leising | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Amendment 4 ( Friend) and prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 57, nays 39 | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 3 (Grubb), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 2 (Friend), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Placed back on second reading | |
2012-01-13 | Motion to recommit to Committee on Judiciary (DeLaney): failed; Roll Call 19: yeas 32, nays 53 | |
2012-01-13 | Amendment 1 (Friend), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative Lehe | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Friend |