IN HB1090 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Assumption of care of cemeteries. Provides that a township or a county may assume maintenance of a cemetery for which it would otherwise not be responsible. Requires a property owner that has a cemetery located on the owner's property to make a reasonable effort to maintain the cemetery. Provides that a township or county that assumes responsibility for maintaining a cemetery may seek reimbursement from the property owner for the cost of maintenance. Provides that a property owner commits a Class C infraction if the property owner fails to maintain the cemetery after the township or county provides two written notices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assumption of care of cemeteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 102
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 304: yeas 83, nays 8
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 46, nays 0
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateSenators Lanane, Grooms, Tomes added as cosponsors
2020-02-24SenateSenator Kruse added as third sponsor
2020-02-24SenateSenator Buck added as second sponsor
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2020-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 63, nays 29
2020-01-21HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as coauthor
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Davisson added as coauthor
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1090/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/7/a/007a6f31/HB1090.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/6/b/d36b342e/HB1090.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/b/6aaba2b6/HB1090.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/0/a/eb0ab50e/HB1090.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/c/7/2fc73fbe/HB1090.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/1/1/a61165be/HB1090.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/3/e/283ed31b/HB1090.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/1/b/521ba77a/HB1090.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/7/6/ad76c5f1/HB1090.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/3/c/673c6b86/HB1090.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/c/f/4fcfa0d3/HB1090.72_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/e/b/0feba90a/HB1090.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/c/7/04c7c979/HB1090.240_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/b/1/38b1462a/HB1090.304_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback