IN HB1084 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Technical corrections. Resolves technical conflicts and addresses technical errors in the Indiana Code. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the code revision commission.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HousePublic Law 32
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-16SenateSenator Taylor G added as second sponsor
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-02SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Young M
2021-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 12: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-01-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Young J

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1084/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/7/8/16780f84/HB1084.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/6/9c664eff/HB1084.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/6/7/db6735c2/HB1084.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/b/5/a0b5db99/HB1084.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/0/8/0508d0e2/HB1084.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/f/e/26fe95bd/HB1084.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/8/6/d086c596/HB1084.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/9/9/9f99a62f/HB1084.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/6/e/8b6e63cd/HB1084.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/2/e/a72ed95c/HB1084.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/b/e/b0befaeb/HB1084.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/a/b/27aba2d3/HB1084.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/b/a/48ba984f/HB1084.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/5/5/205519a1/HB1084.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/0/e/6c0e3b5a/HB1084.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/7/9/60790f16/HB1084.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/6/e/6a6e83de/HB1084.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/c/f/02cf0d6a/HB1084.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/1/6ab1568b/HB1084.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/8/f/cf8f2c27/HB1084.12_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/8/d/6c8dd770/HB1084.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/4/8/4e48793e/HB1084.230_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback