IN HB1080 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on improving the status of children. Provides that the commission on improving the status of children (commission) may appoint an executive director. Provides that an executive director shall perform duties as assigned by the commission. Provides that the office of judicial administration shall pay the salary of the executive director. Removes obsolete provisions related to commission duties.
Title
Commission on improving the status of children. Provides that the commission on improving the status of children (commission) may appoint an executive director. Provides that an executive director shall perform duties as assigned by the commission. Provides that the office of judicial administration shall pay the salary of the executive director. Removes obsolete provisions related to commission duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 13 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Head added as cosponsor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-01-26 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Grooms and Breaux |
2017-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Representatives Summers, Hamm, Klinker added as coauthors |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |