IN HB1076 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that a local port authority contract be in the name of the political subdivision creating the authority. Specifies that a local port authority is an instrumentality of the state and may exercise certain powers independent of any political subdivision. Authorizes local port authorities to borrow money. Relocates bonding authority for local port authorities from the list of general powers to a separate section. Retains the requirement that a local port authority obtain the approval of the governing body that created the authority before entering contracts concerning royalties from natural or mineral resources of land owned by the authority and relocates the requirement from the list of general powers to a separate section.
Title
Local port authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 49 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-23 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: Yeas 30 and Nays 20 | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Nugent, Lewis and R. Young | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: Yeas 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Cheatham added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Stilwell |