IN HB1075 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Commissions and committees. Repeals the following: (1) Indiana advisory commission on intergovernmental relations. (2) Public highway private enterprise review board. (3) Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. (4) Orange County development advisory board. Makes conforming changes. Assigns to the interim study committee on government the task of studying activity of various groups and interstate compacts each even-numbered year. Requires the budget agency to review the salary matrix biennially. Moves a definition from a statute being repealed. Reduces the number of members who must be appointed to a community corrections advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissions and committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-20HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Garten and Bohacek
2022-01-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 90, nays 0
2022-01-18HouseAmendment #2 (Bartlett) motion withdrawn
2022-01-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-10HouseRepresentatives Miller and Jordan added as coauthors
2022-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2022-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representative Bartels
2022-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1075/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/0/d/830d885d/HB1075.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/4/e/d54eb5b8/HB1075.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/2/2/47221e87/HB1075.02.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/1/b/011b0dde/HB1075.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/9/9/16990209/HB1075.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/e/f/dbef99ac/HB1075.02.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/0/a/5e0afabd/HB1075.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/b/1/63b1535a/HB1075.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/8/8/18883334/HB1075.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/b/8/08b8768b/HB1075.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/b/a/8dba37e0/HB1075.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/b/8/27b80e94/HB1075.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/3/b/b83bb12a/HB1075.44_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback