IN HB1074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various higher education matters. Provides that the provisions regarding employment of construction managers as constructors for public works projects applies only to state educational institutions after June 30, 2020. (Current law expires these provisions on July 1, 2020.) Makes changes regarding the: (1) conditions required to qualify for the renewal of a twenty-first century scholars program scholarship; and (2) award amounts to twenty-first century scholars program scholarship applicants who attend a private, approved postsecondary educational institution. Makes the following changes concerning the primary care shortage area scholarship: (1) Amends the practice requirements to receive a scholarship. (2) Amends the repayment
Title
Various higher education matters. Provides that the provisions regarding employment of construction managers as constructors for public works projects applies only to state educational institutions after June 30, 2020. (Current law expires these provisions on July 1, 2020.) Makes changes regarding the: (1) conditions required to qualify for the renewal of a twenty-first century scholars program scholarship; and (2) award amounts to twenty-first century scholars program scholarship applicants who attend a private, approved postsecondary educational institution. Makes the following changes concerning the primary care shortage area scholarship: (1) Amends the practice requirements to receive a scholarship. (2) Amends the repayment
Sponsors
Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Chris May [R] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Public Law 178 |
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 407: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 398: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Melton added as conferee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Stoops removed as conferee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as advisor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Melton, Zay and Buchanan |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Stoops |
2018-03-05 | House | House advisors appointed: May, Schaibley, Smith V and Moseley |
2018-03-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Sullivan and Austin |
2018-03-01 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz |
2018-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-03 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Austin, May and Schaibley |
2018-01-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sullivan |