IN HB1073 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a tenant leasing a dwelling may terminate a lease agreement if the tenant is the victim of certain crimes committed in the tenant's unit. Provides that the lease may be terminated through procedures established under the statute providing for court issuance of emergency possessory orders for residential rental units. Establishes the criteria for the court to consider for termination of the tenant's lease agreement.
Title
Termination of residential leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Senator Simpson | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Lawson, Yoder and Zakas | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: Yeas 92, Nays 2 | |
2010-01-25 | Amendment 1 (Turner), prevailed; Roll Call 60: Yeas 49, Nays 46 | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Representatives VanHaaften, Walorski and Neese added as coauthors | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Fry |