IN HB1072 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 235: yeas 42, nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Various education matters. Provides that the department of education (department) shall provide any data to the state board of education (state board) that the state board determines is necessary to perform the state board's duties under law. Makes changes to the provision requiring school corporations to establish plans for evaluations of certificated employees. Provides that a school corporation may adopt the department's model plan or any other model plan approved by the department and the state board. Requires the education roundtable to make recommendations to the state board regarding the passing scores required at the various grade levels tested under

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education matters. Provides that the department of education (department) shall provide any data to the state board of education (state board) that the state board determines is necessary to perform the state board's duties under law. Makes changes to the provision requiring school corporations to establish plans for evaluations of certificated employees. Provides that a school corporation may adopt the department's model plan or any other model plan approved by the department and the state board. Requires the education roundtable to make recommendations to the state board regarding the passing scores required at the various grade levels tested under

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Smith V) failed (Y: 24 N: 67 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 235: yeas 42, nays 51
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #4 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 181: yeas 24, nays 67
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-06HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Thompson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback