IN HB1071 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies requirements for billing and claims related to anatomic pathology services.
Title
Anatomic pathology services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 222 | |
2011-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 737: yeas 95, nays 1 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 531: yeas 47, nays 3 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Mishler, Rogers and Grooms | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Breaux | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Bacon and Reske | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Welch | |
2011-04-20 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 396: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-03-30 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Miller and Mishler | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 387: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Representative T. Brown added as coauthor | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 1 (Frizzell), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-03-29 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Frizzell |