IN HB1068 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local or regional justice reinvestment advisory councils. Establishes a local or regional justice reinvestment advisory council (local or regional advisory council) in each county in Indiana. Provides that the purpose of a local or regional advisory council is to review local or regional criminal justice systems, policies, and procedures. Provides that the justice reinvestment advisory council shall assist local or regional advisory councils with promoting: (1) the use of evidence based practices; and (2) certain best practices of community based alternatives and recidivism reduction programs. Sets forth duties of local or regional advisory councils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local or regional justice reinvestment advisory councils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 303: yeas 66, nays 18
2021-03-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-16SenateSenator Glick added as third sponsor
2021-03-16SenateSenator Freeman added as second sponsor
2021-03-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-15SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Steuerwald added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1068/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/8/5/8185328f/HB1068.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/0/1/cc0118a4/HB1068.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/a/8/77a8c886/HB1068.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/d/d/89dd8d03/HB1068.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/a/a/8eaaf58f/HB1068.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/9/3/4e93b9f2/HB1068.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/d/9/62d97600/HB1068.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/f/c/75fc97cd/HB1068.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/1/f/751ffe2d/HB1068.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/1/b/a11b21bc/HB1068.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/6/c/bb6c0a0b/HB1068.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/5/7/4857ab8b/HB1068.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/e/3/fae30258/HB1068.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/f/c/4cfcf3f4/HB1068.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/e/2/2be2f25f/HB1068.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/d/3/03d39998/HB1068.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/3/4/6134e43d/HB1068.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/f/f/2effec69/HB1068.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/b/8/beb8a623/HB1068.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/e/a/08eae913/HB1068.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/e/9/bbe9a68f/HB1068.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/c/2/d1c23604/HB1068.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/3/6/233670dc/HB1068.36_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/9/a/6f9a5916/HB1068.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/5/e/f95e45d6/HB1068.228_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/1/b/d41bfb39/HB1068.303_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback