IN HB1065 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fire protection territories. Provides that the procedure for adopting an ordinance or resolution to establish a fire protection territory (territory) applies to expanding an existing territory. Provides that an ordinance or resolution establishing or expanding a territory must include an agreement as to the disposition of the territory's property when a participating unit withdraws or the territory is dissolved. Specifies that with regard to an ordinance or resolution to establish or expand a territory, the unit must hold three separate public hearings to hear public comment regarding the proposed territory before adoption of the ordinance or resolution, with the last public hearing held not later than 10 days before the ordinance or resolution is adopted. Establishes residency requirements for members of a joint executive board of a territory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection territories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HousePublic Law 14
2021-04-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-25SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-16SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-03-16SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateSenator Tomes added as second sponsor
2021-03-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 218: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-08SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-10HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-09HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
2021-02-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representative Frye R
2021-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1065/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/7/8/9578e4df/HB1065.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/3/f/1e3f4663/HB1065.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/2/3/5b2349f0/HB1065.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/f/2/69f2993c/HB1065.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/0/6/a506a978/HB1065.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/6/9/8769846e/HB1065.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/a/e/f1aeb251/HB1065.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/1/2/8e123adb/HB1065.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/e/2/64e278dc/HB1065.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/0/7/c807ee2c/HB1065.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/d/7/4dd78f7a/HB1065.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/2/b/e92bf9a2/HB1065.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/1/9/7c19a2e3/HB1065.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/5/9/375959ae/HB1065.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/0/3/fc0313df/HB1065.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/0/1/7d017724/HB1065.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/f/9/9bf94943/HB1065.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/3/1/1e314d54/HB1065.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/3/03232c35/HB1065.100_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/4/f/c94fe49f/HB1065.02.COMH.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/d/9/3ad91cdc/HB1065.218_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback